MO HB956 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Laid Over (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to gas corporations
Title
Modifies provisions relating to gas corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-02 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H) |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-01 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred: Utility Infrastructure(H) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |