MO HB955 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to agents in the Division of Alcohol and Tobacco Control (ATC)
Title
Modifies provisions relating to agents in the Division of Alcohol and Tobacco Control (ATC)
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Richey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Referred: Public Safety(H) |
2021-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |