MO HB95 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collateral source rule and provides that parties may introduce evidence of the actual cost, rather than the value, of the medical care rendered
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House: HB 95 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, February 22, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 8:00am, SCR 1 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Government Reform(S) |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-02-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 54 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-31 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-01-31 | House | Taken Up |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |