MO HB94 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Representative Tom Hannegan Memorial Highway" in St. Charles County
Title
Establishes the "Representative Tom Hannegan Memorial Highway" in St. Charles County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - House: HB 94 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 10, 2023, 9:30 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-05-01 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-22 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 157 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-21 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-21 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred: Transportation Infrastructure(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |