MO HB913 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Executive Session Held (S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Executive Session Held (S)
Pending: Senate Governmental Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to licensed child care facilities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to licensed child care facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Farnan [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 913 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 913 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - House - House: HB 913 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 105 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED: Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S) |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-27 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 3 |
2023-03-27 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-27 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Perfected (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-02-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2023-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |