MO HB912 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Title
Creates new provisions relating to the sale of kratom products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-04-25 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-04-05 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2023-03-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2023-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |