MO HB902 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a school board of a district that has been unaccredited for three years to appoint a parent of a student to the board
Title
Requires a school board of a district that has been unaccredited for three years to appoint a parent of a student to the board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB902&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1639H.01I.pdf |