MO HB89 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Workforce Development(H)
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals main provisions relating to wage rates on public works and modifies certain related provisions
Title
Repeals main provisions relating to wage rates on public works and modifies certain related provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |