MO HB876 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the provision requiring arbitration, if requested by a plaintiff, in a negligence action against the Department of Transportation
Title
Repeals the provision requiring arbitration, if requested by a plaintiff, in a negligence action against the Department of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB876&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1786H.01I.pdf |