MO HB875 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that an employment exemption variance for persons required to have an ignition interlock device shall not be granted to a person who controls an entity that owns an employer-owned vehicle
Title
Provides that an employment exemption variance for persons required to have an ignition interlock device shall not be granted to a person who controls an entity that owns an employer-owned vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |