MO HB856 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-25 - Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all state and federal offices to use an instant runoff voting method
Title
Requires all state and federal offices to use an instant runoff voting method
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Stacy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-19 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2017-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB856&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0507H.01I.pdf |