MO HB841 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-03 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Agriculture Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for qualifying milk producers in Missouri
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for qualifying milk producers in Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ross [R] | Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred: Agriculture Policy(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB841&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0841I.htm |