MO HB832 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri State Board of Accountancy by prohibiting the board from receiving any revenue from the General Revenue Fund or any of its costs to be incurred by the state
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri State Board of Accountancy by prohibiting the board from receiving any revenue from the General Revenue Fund or any of its costs to be incurred by the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB832&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0832I.htm |