MO HB831 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions related to the retirement of police officers
Title
Modifies provisions related to the retirement of police officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 831 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 831 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 122 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 831 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 144 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: HB 831 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 122 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 |
2017-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-05-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 3 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 adopted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 3:00 p.m., Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Hearing rescheduled |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, April 21, 2017, 8:00am, Bingham Conference Room |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 12, 2017, 10:00am, SCR 1 Amended |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Health and Pensions(S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-03 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 32 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-30 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-03-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2017-03-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill Reconsidered (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |