MO HB827 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law relating to assessments made by the Public Service Commission
Title
Changes the law relating to assessments made by the Public Service Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |