MO HB824 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to investment disclosures
Title
Establishes provisions relating to investment disclosures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2023-01-19 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |