MO HB813 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds provisions relating to the regulation of certain professions
Title
Adds provisions relating to the regulation of certain professions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House: HB 813 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-21 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 24, 2017, 2:00 p.m., SCR 1 |
2017-04-11 | House | Second read and referred: Senate Professional Registration(S) |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-05 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To - relating to regulation of certain professions |
2017-04-05 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |