MO HB807 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property in Christian County
Title
Authorizes the conveyance of certain state property in Christian County
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Hudson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-02 | House | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H) |
2023-01-18 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |