MO HB798 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Action Postponed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to post certain financial information on the district's website for free public access
Title
Requires school districts to post certain financial information on the district's website for free public access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred: Select Committee on General Laws(H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency(H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB798&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0798I.PDF |