MO HB781 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts a sunset provision for administrative rules
Title
Enacts a sunset provision for administrative rules
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2021-05-04 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2021-04-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2021-04-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2021-04-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |