MO HB769 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the "Employment Security Program Integrity Act of 2021"
Title
Authorizes the "Employment Security Program Integrity Act of 2021"
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Grier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Workforce Development(H) |
2021-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |