MO HB766 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allows health maintenance organizations to require cost sharing as a condition of receiving health care services
Title
Allows health maintenance organizations to require cost sharing as a condition of receiving health care services
Sponsors
Rep. Caleb Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - HB 766 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 117 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 766 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - HB 766 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 766 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - HB 766 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, Ajpril 28, 2015, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 33 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Insurance(H) |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-04 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |