MO HB763 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H)
Pending: House Select Committee on Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits the Conservation Commission and the Department of Conservation from engaging in prohibited conduct with a connected not-for-profit corporation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the Conservation Commission and the Department of Conservation from engaging in prohibited conduct with a connected not-for-profit corporation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseReferred: Select Committee on Agriculture(H)
2015-04-28HouseReported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-27HouseVoted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
2015-04-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-04-20HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-04-14HouseReferred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H)
2015-02-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback