MO HB751 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Insurance Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires tobacco-derived products and vapor products to be subject to the same provisions as tobacco products
Title
Requires tobacco-derived products and vapor products to be subject to the same provisions as tobacco products
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB751&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0751I.htm |