MO HB740 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the fees on the retail sale of a lead-acid battery as well as the fees on certain hazardous waste to December 31, 2018
Title
Extends the fees on the retail sale of a lead-acid battery as well as the fees on certain hazardous waste to December 31, 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2013-02-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB740&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0740I.htm |