MO HB740 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the current exemptions from sales and use tax by defining "manufacturing, processing, compounding, mining, or producing" to include testing, installing, calibrating, maintaining, and repairing
Title
Clarifies the current exemptions from sales and use tax by defining "manufacturing, processing, compounding, mining, or producing" to include testing, installing, calibrating, maintaining, and repairing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-05-03 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-05-03 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB740&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0740I.htm |