MO HB734 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits visual or aural recordings or photographs of a minor who is alleged to be a victim of child abuse to be shared with any person who is not required by law to have the recordings or photographs
Title
Prohibits visual or aural recordings or photographs of a minor who is alleged to be a victim of child abuse to be shared with any person who is not required by law to have the recordings or photographs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - HB 734 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 734 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - HB 734 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, Senate Lounge |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2015-04-14 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary(H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 2 AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |