MO HB710 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-09 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding a dissolution petition for a community improvement district
Title
Changes the laws regarding a dissolution petition for a community improvement district
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB710&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0710I.htm |