MO HB709 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding entities regulated by the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Title
Changes the laws regarding entities regulated by the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Sponsors
Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - HB 709 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 709 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 709 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - HB 709 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - HB 709 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-02 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AS AMENDESD AYES: 141 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) - Tuesday, April 28, 2015, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2015-04-23 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 12:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-16 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Insurance(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-02-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred: Property, Casualty, and Life Insurance(H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |