MO HB702 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
Pending: Senate Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the operation of certain law enforcement agencies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the operation of certain law enforcement agencies
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Christ [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - House - House: HB 702 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: HB 702 (*HA 5, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: HB 702 (*HA 5, A.A.) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 5, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 3 |
2023-03-06 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, HA 1 to HA 5 and HA 5, as amended, adopted. |
2023-03-01 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2023-03-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2023-03-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - with a time limit of 3 hours and 30 minutes of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule (24)(28). AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H) |
2023-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-02-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-01-23 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2023-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |