MO HB701 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to retirement systems
Title
Modifies provisions relating to retirement systems
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: HB 701 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 158 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 21, 1 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 14, 1 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 7, 2021, 1:00pm or upon adjournment, Senate Lounge |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Health and Pensions(S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 158 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Perfected (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Pensions(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |