MO HB7 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-11 - No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses and distributions of the departments of Economic Development; Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration; and Labor and Industrial R
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses and distributions of the departments of Economic Development; Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration; and Labor and Industrial R
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Stream [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | No Motion Made - to override Governor's veto |
2013-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-28 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-09 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-09 | House | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) |
2013-05-09 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 35 |
2013-05-09 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 125 NOES: 31 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) |
2013-04-30 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES STREAM, FLANIGAN, MCMANUS |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS SCHAEFER, RUPP, KEHOE, CURLS, AND WALSH |
2013-04-30 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2013-04-29 | House | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED, SA 3 ADOPTED |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 30 NOES: 2 |
2013-04-22 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-19 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 18, 2013, 8:30 a.m., SCR 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013 Evening Hearing Cancelled |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 15, 2013, UPON AFTERNOON ADJOURNMENT |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2013, 8:30 a.m., SCR 2 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 15, 2013, Upon Evening Adjournment, SCR 2 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - FRIDAY, APRIL 12, 2013, 9:00AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 11, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 9, 2013, 8:30AM, SCR 2 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-03-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 41 |
2013-03-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED. HA3 WAS DEFEATED MAKING HA 2 MOOT |
2013-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass with Time Limit (H) - Time limit of six hours total debate on Perfection. |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2013-02-15 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2013-02-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |