MO HB691 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-26 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all members of a public water supply district board of directors to be voters who have resided in the district for one year prior to election
Title
Requires all members of a public water supply district board of directors to be voters who have resided in the district for one year prior to election
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB691&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0691I.htm |