MO HB665 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to qualifications for public office
Title
Modifies provisions relating to qualifications for public office
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled (H) |