MO HB658 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reclassifies some forms of methamphetamine precursor drugs from Schedule IV and V controlled substances to Schedule III requiring a prescription to be known as the Meth Lab Elimination Act
Title
Reclassifies some forms of methamphetamine precursor drugs from Schedule IV and V controlled substances to Schedule III requiring a prescription to be known as the Meth Lab Elimination Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-05-09 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-05-09 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-05-09 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-05-05 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-05-03 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-05-03 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-05-02 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-05-02 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-21 | Rules - Hearing Cancelled | |
2011-04-14 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |