MO HB650 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Department of Natural Resources
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Department of Natural Resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-11 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | Senate Votes to Override Veto (S) |
2013-09-11 | House | House Message (H) |
2013-09-11 | House | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-09-11 | House | House Votes to Override Veto (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 50 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-07-12 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-12 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-12 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-15 | House | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 126 NOES: 31 |
2013-05-15 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 94 NOES: 63 |
2013-05-15 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 91 NOES: 66 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 9 |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 1 TO SA 2, SA 2AA, SA 1 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 3, SSA 1 FOR SA 3 AA ADOPTED |
2013-05-15 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, 1:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |