MO HB632 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act to monitor the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances
Title
Establishes the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act to monitor the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB632&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0632I.htm |