MO HB613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows public institutions of higher education to charge differential tuition rates based on program of study.
Title
Allows public institutions of higher education to charge differential tuition rates based on program of study.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2019-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB613&year=2019&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1390H.01I.pdf |