MO HB604 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the "School Turnaround Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "School Turnaround Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 101 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 114 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - House: HB 604 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 4 N: 133 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2019-04-01 - House - House: HB 604 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-11HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-17HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-17HouseEmergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 4 NOES: 133 PRESENT: 1
2019-05-17HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 116 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 2
2019-05-17HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS#2 as amended AYES: 114 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 1
2019-05-17HouseTaken Up
2019-05-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-17HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-17HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-17SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 as amended
2019-05-17SenateEmergency Clause Adopted (S)
2019-05-17SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1
2019-05-17SenateTaken Up
2019-05-17SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-17SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-16SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-16SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS#2 SA 1
2019-05-16SenateTaken Up
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2019-05-16SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-16SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2019-05-16SenateTaken Up
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6
2019-05-09SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2019-05-09SenateTaken Up
2019-05-02SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-02SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-02SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-30SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 2, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-29SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-25SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-23SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Pershing Conference Room
2019-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 16, 2019, 1:00pm, Senate Loounge
2019-04-09SenateSecond read and referred: Education(S)
2019-04-01HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-04-01HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
2019-04-01HouseTaken Up
2019-03-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-03-26HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-03-25HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 2, HA 3 adopted
2019-03-25HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-03-25HouseTaken Up
2019-03-13HouseLaid Over (H) - with HA 1 pending
2019-03-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-03-13HouseTaken Up
2019-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2019-03-05HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-03-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-27HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-27HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-26HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-19HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-31HouseReferred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
2019-01-17HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB604&year=2019&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373S.10F.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/hlrbillspdf/1373S.10T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/044.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.045.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.044.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.043.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/072.042.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805171607-1684.pdf#1611
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905171607-1684.pdf#1611

Bill Comments

feedback