MO HB601 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Patient Safety in Radiologic Imaging and Radiation Therapy Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Patient Safety in Radiologic Imaging and Radiation Therapy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2017-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB601&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0064H.02I.pdf |