MO HB60 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding lobbyist expenditures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding lobbyist expenditures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-17 - House - House: HB 60 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - House - House: HB 60 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 147 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-31SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-01-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, January 31, 2017, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
2017-01-26SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2017-01-17HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-01-17HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 2
2017-01-17HouseTaken Up
2017-01-12HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 as amended adopted AYES: 147 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 2
2017-01-17HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To - relating solely to lobbyist expenditures, was agreed to.
2017-01-12HouseTaken Up
2017-01-12HouseLaid Over (H)
2017-01-12HouseTaken Up
2017-01-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-01-10HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-10HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-09HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-01-09HouseReported Do Pass (H)
2017-01-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-01-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-01-09HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-01-05HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2016-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback