MO HB59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that the Missouri Board of Nursing Home Administrators mail licensure renewal applications to every person whose license must be renewed during the year and specifies that the board must notify these persons
Title
Removes the requirement that the Missouri Board of Nursing Home Administrators mail licensure renewal applications to every person whose license must be renewed during the year and specifies that the board must notify these persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB59&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0059I.htm |