MO HB581 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-16 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Tax Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Earned Income Tax Credit Act which authorizes an individual income tax credit equal to 20% of any earned income tax credit claimed by the taxpayer on his or her federal income tax return
Title
Establishes the Missouri Earned Income Tax Credit Act which authorizes an individual income tax credit equal to 20% of any earned income tax credit claimed by the taxpayer on his or her federal income tax return
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Tax Reform (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB581&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0581I.htm |