MO HB578 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the motor vehicle biennial registration option so that all motor vehicles, regardless of model year, have a two-year registration option
Title
Modifies the motor vehicle biennial registration option so that all motor vehicles, regardless of model year, have a two-year registration option
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - House: HB 578 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: HB 578 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: HB 578 (HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: HB 578 (HA 1, A.A.) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 104 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: HB 578 (HA 1 HA 1) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 102 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 29, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 30, 2021, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | House Message (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-03-03 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED |
2021-03-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Transportation(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-22 | House | Prefiled (H) |