MO HB572 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Small Business AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Small Business AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the powers of local health authorities
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the powers of local health authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Small Business AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-11 | House | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Small Business(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |