MO HB572 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions related to elementary and secondary education.
Title
Creates new provisions related to elementary and secondary education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-27 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Student Accountability(H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |