MO HB567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates December 4 as "Alpha Phi Alpha Day" in Missouri in honor of the first black intercollegiate Greek-letter fraternity established for African-Americans
Title
Designates December 4 as "Alpha Phi Alpha Day" in Missouri in honor of the first black intercollegiate Greek-letter fraternity established for African-Americans
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Dunn [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - HB 567 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass consent |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions(S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-04-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-04-01 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred: Trade and Tourism(H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |