MO HB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-14 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Fleeing Motorist Protection Act, which limits criminal or civil liability when a person flees an unlawful or a riotous assemblage while in a motor vehicle
Title
Establishes the Fleeing Motorist Protection Act, which limits criminal or civil liability when a person flees an unlawful or a riotous assemblage while in a motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |