MO HB559 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a city to place unrecovered costs and overdue property fines on property tax bills
Title
Allows a city to place unrecovered costs and overdue property fines on property tax bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB559&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0559I.PDF |