MO HB556 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions related to gaming

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions related to gaming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - House: HB 556 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 118 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2023-03-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 118 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 2
2023-03-22HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2023-03-22HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2023-03-20HousePerfected (H)
2023-03-20HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2023-03-20HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2023-03-20HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2023-03-08HousePlaced on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
2023-03-06HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2023-03-06HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2023-03-06HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-03-02HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2023-03-02HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2023-02-23HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2023-02-23HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2023-02-08HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2023-01-25HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2023-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2023-01-04HouseRead First Time (H)
2023-01-03HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB556&year=2023&code=R
Texthttp://reflect.legiscan.com/Proxy.php
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.02H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.06H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.07H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/amendpdf/1472H03.10H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB0556I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1472H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB0556C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1472H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/fiscal/fispdf/1472H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/sumpdf/HB0556P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills231/rollcalls/040.006.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback